Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.352 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7740A | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Senate | 11/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |