Senate | 09/27/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.386 | ||
Senate | 09/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.497 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted for a8304b | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7748C | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7748B | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.883 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7748A | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |