Senate | 06/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | AMENDED 7769A | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1352 | ||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |