Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to mental health | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1396 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |