Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1208 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7779B | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Senate | 12/22/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 7779A | ||
Senate | 12/22/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES | ||
Senate | 12/01/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |