Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.402 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | substituted for a9035a | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7780A | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.353 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Senate | 12/01/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |