Assembly | 12/13/2024 | approval memo.31 | ||
Assembly | 12/13/2024 | signed chap.561 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.369 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7781A | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | amended on third reading 9169a | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7781A | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.434 | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | referred to correction | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.369 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |