Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8081B | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7801A | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.946 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 12/11/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |