Senate | 06/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | referred to children and families | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1397 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7815A | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |