Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7825A | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.719 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 12/20/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |