Senate | 11/22/2024 | VETOED MEMO.65 | ||
Senate | 11/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.256 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | substituted for a8431a | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | referred to social services | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7830A | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.213 | ||
Senate | 12/20/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |