Senate | 03/11/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8467A | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.412 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7833A | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS | ||
Senate | 12/20/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |