Senate | 09/27/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.387 | ||
Senate | 09/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.361 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | substituted for a10051a | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | referred to real property taxation | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7861A | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.247 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |