Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A9354B | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7869B | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1491 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7869A | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |