Assembly | 03/26/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.145 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | REFERENCE CHANGED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |