Assembly | 06/04/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.670 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |