Senate | 01/26/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.10 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.12 | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | substituted for a8572 | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2024 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.16 | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES |