Senate | 03/01/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.94 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.315 | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | substituted for a8487 | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.19 | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES |