Senate | 02/07/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.62 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.251 | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | substituted for a8542 | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2024 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.21 | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES |