Senate | 02/07/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.65 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.293 | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2024 | substituted for a8526 | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2024 | referred to environmental conservation | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.24 | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES |