Senate | 03/22/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.108 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.334 | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | substituted for a8498 | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.184 | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES |