Senate | 03/01/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.100 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.275 | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | substituted for a8499 | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.187 | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES |