Senate | 01/26/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.14 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.217 | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | substituted for a8505 | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2024 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.43 | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES |