Senate | 03/01/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.101 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.289 | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | substituted for a8627 | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.192 | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES |