Senate | 02/13/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.88 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.255 | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2024 | substituted for a8547 | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.197 | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES |