Senate | 03/01/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.105 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.299 | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | substituted for a8485 | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | referred to mental health | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.59 | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES |