Senate | 01/26/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.19 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.9 | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | substituted for a8534 | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | referred to racing and wagering | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.66 | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES |