Assembly | 03/19/2024 | referred to small business | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.151 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |