Assembly | 05/08/2024 | referred to science and technology | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8138A | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.404 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |