Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.581 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a10324a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8139A | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.504 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |