Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8834B | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1257 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8144C | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8144B | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8144A | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |