Senate | 06/28/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.156 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.54 | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | substituted for a9066 | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2024 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.839 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |