Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1764 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8147B | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8147A | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | REFERRED TO BANKS |