Senate | 12/13/2024 | VETOED MEMO.104 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.333 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted for a8878a | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1498 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8152A | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |