Senate | 11/22/2024 | VETOED MEMO.68 | ||
Senate | 11/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.180 | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | substituted for a8942 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.153 |