Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A7939B | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1499 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8182B | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8182A | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |