Assembly | 03/11/2024 | referred to people with disabilities | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.408 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |