Assembly | 05/21/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.923 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE |