Senate | 11/11/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.452 | ||
Senate | 11/08/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.613 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a7956a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1848 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8338A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |