Senate | 06/07/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8947C | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8358C | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1055 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8358B | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8358A | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | REFERRED TO LABOR |