Senate | 11/22/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.19 | ||
Senate | 11/22/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.514 | ||
Senate | 11/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.77 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | substituted for a9438 | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.361 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8373A | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |