Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8409B | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2024 | referred to education | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.519 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8409A | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |