Senate | 09/11/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.314 | ||
Senate | 09/11/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.618 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a8868 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1502 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |