Senate | 12/13/2024 | VETOED MEMO.105 | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.413 | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | substituted for a9209 | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2024 | referred to racing and wagering | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.416 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |