Senate | 05/16/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8982A | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.742 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8469A | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |