Senate | 10/09/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.10 | ||
Senate | 10/09/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.430 | ||
Senate | 10/09/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.506 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted for a9862a | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1710 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8479A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |