Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A9232B | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8485B | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1399 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8485A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |