Senate | 09/17/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.317 | ||
Senate | 09/17/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.342 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted for a9102c | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8486C | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | AMENDED 8486B | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1400 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8486A | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH |