Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.571 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a8595a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 8504A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1581 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |