Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8553C | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.886 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8553B | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8553A | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |